Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1852 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021