Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1853 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021