Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1863 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1863
1+By: Bucy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 1863
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
3+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Transportation; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1863 By: Seliger
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the issuance of Make-A-Wish specialty license plates.
614 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
715 SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
816 is amended by adding Section 504.675 to read as follows:
917 Sec. 504.675. MAKE-A-WISH LICENSE PLATES. (a) The
1018 department shall issue specialty license plates that include the
1119 words "Make-A-Wish" and an image of the blue Make-A-Wish logo. The
1220 department shall design the plates in consultation with the Central
1321 and South Texas chapter of Make-A-Wish.
1422 (b) After deduction of the department's administrative
1523 costs, the remainder of the fee for issuance of the license plates
1624 shall be deposited to the credit of an account created by the
1725 comptroller in the manner provided by Section 504.6012(b). Money
1826 deposited to that account may be used only by the Health and Human
1927 Services Commission to make grants to a nonprofit organization that
2028 has a history of providing services to children diagnosed with a
2129 critical illness for the purpose of providing those services.
2230 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
23- ______________________________ ______________________________
24- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
25- I certify that H.B. No. 1863 was passed by the House on May 8,
26- 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 125, Nays 14, 2 present, not
27- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
28- No. 1863 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0,
29- 1 present, not voting.
30- ______________________________
31- Chief Clerk of the House
32- I certify that H.B. No. 1863 was passed by the Senate, with
33- amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
34- 0.
35- ______________________________
36- Secretary of the Senate
37- APPROVED: __________________
38- Date
39- __________________
40- Governor
31+ * * * * *