Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1905 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021