Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1920 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021