Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1930 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021