House | 05/13/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Filed |