Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1981 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021