Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1998 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 5, 2021