Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2001 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021