Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2044 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021