Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021