Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2058 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 8, 2021
Fiscal Note March 27, 2021