Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2063 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021