Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2091 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021