Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2094 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2021

                    By: Martinez (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2094
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 14, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the right to remove property encroaching on areas owned
 or controlled by the Hidalgo County Drainage District Number 1.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section, "telecommunications
 provider" has the meaning assigned by Section 51.002, Utilities
 Code.
 (b)  This section does not apply to property owned by a
 telecommunications provider.
 (c)  In order to carry out district purposes, the Hidalgo
 County Drainage District Number 1 may remove real or personal
 property placed on land owned by the district or land subject to an
 easement held by the district, regardless of when the real or
 personal property was put in place and without the consent of the
 owner of the property. The district must send notice by certified
 mail to the owner of property on which the district intends to act
 under this section. Not earlier than the 30th day after the date
 the notice is sent, the district must send a second notice by
 certified mail. The district may use existing civil lawsuit
 processes against the owner of the property to recover the cost of
 removing the property not earlier than the 30th day after the date
 the second notice was received.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *