Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2094 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill April 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021