Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB21 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021