Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2108 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021