Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2126 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/26/2021

                            By: Walle H.B. No. 2126


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for the supplemental nutrition assistance
 program and the provision of employment and training services under
 the program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 33.0007 and 33.021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.0007.  THIRD-PARTY SERVICE PROVIDERS OF SNAP
 EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING SERVICES.  (a)  The Health and Human
 Services Commission shall contract with one or more third-party
 service providers to provide supplemental nutrition assistance
 program employment and training services. The Health and Human
 Services Commission shall prioritize contracting with a
 third-party service provider that:
 (1)  expands the types and varieties of those services
 available to a recipient of supplemental nutrition assistance
 benefits; and
 (2)  has a demonstrated record of preparing individuals
 for entry into workforce industries with a high demand for skilled
 labor.
 (b)  In contracting with a third-party service provider, the
 Health and Human Services Commission, shall ensure the terms of the
 contract are designed in a manner that maximizes this state's
 receipt of all available federal matching money for supplemental
 nutrition assistance program employment and training services.
 Sec. 33.021.  SNAP ELIGIBILITY OF CERTAIN STUDENTS ENROLLED
 IN POSTSECONDARY EDUCATION PROGRAMS.  (a)  In this section,
 "postsecondary educational institution" includes:
 (1)  an institution of higher education or a private or
 independent institution of higher education as defined by Section
 61.003, Education Code; and
 (2)  a career school or college as defined by Section
 132.001, Education Code.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules consistent
 with federal law to provide supplemental nutrition assistance
 benefits to students enrolled in a postsecondary educational
 institution.  The rules must:
 (1)  identify the types of postsecondary degrees or
 programs in which a student must be enrolled to qualify for
 supplemental nutrition assistance benefits, including
 participation in any work placement or unpaid internship associated
 with a postsecondary educational institution; and
 (2)  ensure a student remains eligible for supplemental
 nutrition assistance benefits during a break in the semester or
 academic term of the postsecondary educational institution in which
 the student is enrolled.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall establish a work group
 to provide input for the adoption of rules under Subsection (b). In
 adopting the rules, the executive commissioner shall consider the
 work group's input.
 (d)  The work group is composed of at least 9 but not more
 than 13 members who are representatives of:
 (1)  postsecondary educational institutions; or
 (2)  non-profit organizations serving low-income
 individuals.
 (e)  The executive commissioner shall ensure members of the
 work group represent various types of postsecondary educational
 institutions located throughout this state. The executive
 commissioner shall appoint one work group member to serve as
 presiding officer.
 (f)  The work group is automatically abolished on the
 adoption of rules under Subsection (b).
 (g)  Subsections (c), (d), (e), and (f) and this subsection
 expire September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than December 31, 2021, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall establish the work group required by Section 33.021, Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than December 31, 2022, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt the rules required by Section 33.021, Human Resources Code,
 as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.