Senate | 05/10/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Record vote RV#853 | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Record vote RV#839 | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Amended 1-Clardy | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Elections | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Filed |