1 | | - | H.B. No. 2168 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Krause, Bucy (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 2168 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 24, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2168 By: Powell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the repeal of a criminal offense for certain charitable |
---|
6 | 14 | | raffle ticket sales by professional sports team charitable |
---|
7 | 15 | | foundations. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Sections 2004.002(1-a) and 2004.009(a), |
---|
10 | 18 | | Occupations Code, are repealed. |
---|
11 | 19 | | SECTION 2. The repeal by this Act of Section 2004.009(a), |
---|
12 | 20 | | Occupations Code, does not apply to an offense committed under that |
---|
13 | 21 | | section before the effective date of the repeal. An offense |
---|
14 | 22 | | committed before the effective date of the repeal is governed by the |
---|
15 | 23 | | law as it existed on the date the offense was committed, and the |
---|
16 | 24 | | former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of |
---|
17 | 25 | | this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of |
---|
18 | 26 | | the repeal if any element of the offense occurred before that date. |
---|
19 | 27 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
20 | 28 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
21 | 29 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
22 | 30 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
23 | 31 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
24 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
25 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
26 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2168 was passed by the House on May |
---|
27 | | - | 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 107, Nays 38, 1 present, not |
---|
28 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
29 | | - | No. 2168 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 104, Nays 44, |
---|
30 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
31 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
32 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
33 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2168 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
34 | | - | amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays |
---|
35 | | - | 4. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
38 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Date |
---|
40 | | - | __________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 32 | + | * * * * * |
---|