Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2181 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021