Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021