Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB220 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021