1 | | - | H.B. No. 2213 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Frullo, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2213 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water, |
---|
| 4 | + | Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 13, 2021, reported adversely, |
---|
| 5 | + | with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2213 By: Kolkhorst |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the slaughter and processing of exotic animals for |
---|
6 | 14 | | donation to a nonprofit food bank. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Section 433.006, Health and |
---|
9 | 17 | | Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 433.006. EXEMPTION FOR PERSONAL USE OR DONATION TO |
---|
11 | 19 | | NONPROFIT FOOD BANK [EXEMPTION]. |
---|
12 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Section 433.006, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
13 | 21 | | amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to |
---|
14 | 22 | | read as follows: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (a) The provisions of this chapter requiring inspection of |
---|
16 | 24 | | the slaughter of livestock and the preparation of carcasses, parts |
---|
17 | 25 | | of carcasses, meat, and meat food products at establishments |
---|
18 | 26 | | conducting those operations do not apply to the slaughtering of |
---|
19 | 27 | | livestock or the preparation and transportation in intrastate |
---|
20 | 28 | | commerce of those articles if: |
---|
21 | 29 | | (1) the articles are: |
---|
22 | 30 | | (A) livestock exclusively for personal use by the |
---|
23 | 31 | | owner of the livestock, a member of the owner's family, or a |
---|
24 | 32 | | nonpaying guest of the owner; or |
---|
25 | 33 | | (B) exotic animals exclusively for donation by a |
---|
26 | 34 | | hunter to a nonprofit food bank, as defined by Section 418.026(a), |
---|
27 | 35 | | Government Code; |
---|
28 | 36 | | (2) the slaughter or preparation is conducted at the |
---|
29 | 37 | | owner's premises, the premises where the hunter killed the exotic |
---|
30 | 38 | | animal, or at a processing establishment; and |
---|
31 | 39 | | (3) the transportation is limited to moving the |
---|
32 | 40 | | carcasses, parts of carcasses, meat, and meat food products to and |
---|
33 | 41 | | from: |
---|
34 | 42 | | (A) the owner's premises and a processing |
---|
35 | 43 | | establishment; or |
---|
36 | 44 | | (B) the premises where the hunter killed the |
---|
37 | 45 | | exotic animal, the processing establishment, and the nonprofit food |
---|
38 | 46 | | bank. |
---|
39 | 47 | | (d) An article described by Subsection (a)(1)(B) may not be |
---|
40 | 48 | | combined with: |
---|
41 | 49 | | (1) a meat food product regulated under the Federal |
---|
42 | 50 | | Meat Inspection Act (21 U.S.C. Section 601 et seq.); or |
---|
43 | 51 | | (2) a poultry product regulated under the federal |
---|
44 | 52 | | Poultry Products Inspection Act (21 U.S.C. Section 451 et seq.). |
---|
45 | 53 | | SECTION 3. Section 433.024(b), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
46 | 54 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
47 | 55 | | (b) The department shall inspect each slaughtering |
---|
48 | 56 | | establishment whose primary business is the selling of livestock to |
---|
49 | 57 | | be slaughtered by the purchaser on premises owned or operated by the |
---|
50 | 58 | | seller. This subsection does not nullify the provisions in Section |
---|
51 | 59 | | 433.006 relating to exemptions [personal use exemption]. |
---|
52 | 60 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
55 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2213 was passed by the House on April |
---|
56 | | - | 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1, 2 present, not |
---|
57 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
58 | | - | No. 2213 on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 3, |
---|
59 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
60 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
62 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2213 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
63 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
64 | | - | 0. |
---|
65 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
67 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Date |
---|
69 | | - | __________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 61 | + | * * * * * |
---|