Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 10, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021