Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021