Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2247 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 87R8252 KKR-D
22 By: Shine H.B. No. 2247
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to a demonstration program at the State Office of Risk
88 Management for real-time processing of workers' compensation
99 authorizations of payment for medical services and medical bills.
1010 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1111 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 412, Labor Code, is
1212 amended by adding Section 412.0129 to read as follows:
1313 Sec. 412.0129. AUTHORIZATION OF PAYMENT FOR MEDICAL
1414 SERVICES AND MEDICAL BILLS REAL-TIME PROCESSING DEMONSTRATION
1515 PROGRAM. (a) The office may develop and implement a demonstration
1616 program for processing workers' compensation authorizations of
1717 payment for medical services and medical bills in real time if the
1818 office determines that the program would be cost-effective.
1919 (b) The demonstration program described by Subsection (a)
2020 must include:
2121 (1) a secure single platform, Internet-based portal
2222 for use by the office, state agencies, injured employees, and
2323 health care providers;
2424 (2) the ability to collect, input, and transmit
2525 administrative and clinical data, including:
2626 (A) patient information;
2727 (B) health care provider contracts;
2828 (C) treatment guidelines; and
2929 (D) other information the office considers
3030 necessary for processing authorizations and medical bills;
3131 (3) an automated process to streamline requests for
3232 authorizations of payment for medical services and peer reviews at
3333 the point of care; and
3434 (4) return-to-work best practices for workers'
3535 compensation claims, including complex case management.
3636 (c) The workers' compensation research and evaluation group
3737 may assist the office in identifying and adopting measures for
3838 evaluating the demonstration program.
3939 (d) The evaluation period for the demonstration program
4040 shall end on June 30, 2024.
4141 (e) If the office implements a demonstration program under
4242 this section, not later than December 31, 2024, the office shall
4343 provide to the board a report that:
4444 (1) evaluates the program, including any effects of
4545 the program on administrative cost savings;
4646 (2) recommends whether to use the process implemented
4747 under the program on a permanent basis; and
4848 (3) if the office determines administrative cost
4949 savings were not achieved by the process implemented under the
5050 program, includes:
5151 (A) the reasons that the program did not result
5252 in administrative cost savings; and
5353 (B) recommendations for proposed legislation to
5454 develop a cost-effective system for processing workers'
5555 compensation authorizations of payment for medical services and
5656 medical bills in real time.
5757 (f) If the report of the demonstration program under
5858 Subsection (e) indicates that administrative cost savings are
5959 achieved by the process implemented under the program, the board
6060 may adopt and use the process on a permanent basis.
6161 (g) This section expires September 1, 2025.
6262 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2022, the State Office
6363 of Risk Management shall study and make a determination as to
6464 whether the demonstration program described by Section 412.0129,
6565 Labor Code, as added by this Act, would be cost-effective. If the
6666 office determines the program would be cost-effective and decides
6767 to implement the program, the office shall fully implement the
6868 program not later than January 1, 2023.
6969 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7070 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7171 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7272 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7373 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.