1 | | - | H.B. No. 2256 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Guerra, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2256 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 24, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to creating a bilingual special education certification to |
---|
6 | 12 | | teach students of limited English proficiency with disabilities. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is |
---|
9 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 21.04891 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | Sec. 21.04891. BILINGUAL SPECIAL EDUCATION CERTIFICATION. |
---|
11 | 17 | | (a) In this section, "limited English proficiency" has the meaning |
---|
12 | 18 | | assigned by Section 29.052. |
---|
13 | 19 | | (b) To ensure that there are teachers with special training |
---|
14 | 20 | | in providing instruction to students of limited English proficiency |
---|
15 | 21 | | with disabilities, the board shall establish a bilingual special |
---|
16 | 22 | | education certificate. |
---|
17 | 23 | | (c) To be eligible for a certificate established under this |
---|
18 | 24 | | section, a person must: |
---|
19 | 25 | | (1) satisfactorily complete the coursework for that |
---|
20 | 26 | | certificate in an educator preparation program, including a |
---|
21 | 27 | | skills-based course of instruction on providing instruction to |
---|
22 | 28 | | students of limited English proficiency with disabilities, which |
---|
23 | 29 | | must include instruction on: |
---|
24 | 30 | | (A) the foundations of bilingual, multicultural, |
---|
25 | 31 | | and second language special education; |
---|
26 | | - | (B) providing individualized education programs |
---|
27 | | - | for students of limited English proficiency with disabilities; |
---|
28 | | - | (C) providing assessment of students of limited |
---|
29 | | - | English proficiency with and without disabilities; |
---|
| 32 | + | (B) providing culturally responsive |
---|
| 33 | + | individualized education programs for students of limited English |
---|
| 34 | + | proficiency with disabilities; |
---|
| 35 | + | (C) providing assessment for equity and |
---|
| 36 | + | inclusion of students of limited English proficiency with and |
---|
| 37 | + | without disabilities; |
---|
38 | 46 | | (2) perform satisfactorily on a bilingual special |
---|
39 | 47 | | education certificate examination prescribed by the board; and |
---|
40 | 48 | | (3) satisfy any other requirements prescribed by the |
---|
41 | 49 | | board. |
---|
42 | 50 | | SECTION 2. The State Board for Educator Certification shall |
---|
43 | 51 | | propose rules: |
---|
44 | 52 | | (1) establishing requirements and prescribing an |
---|
45 | 53 | | examination for a bilingual special education certificate as |
---|
46 | 54 | | required by Section 21.04891, Education Code, as added by this Act; |
---|
47 | 55 | | and |
---|
48 | 56 | | (2) establishing standards to govern the approval and |
---|
49 | 57 | | renewal of approval of educator preparation programs for bilingual |
---|
50 | 58 | | special education certification. |
---|
51 | 59 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
54 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2256 was passed by the House on May 6, |
---|
55 | | - | 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 113, Nays 30, 1 present, not |
---|
56 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
57 | | - | No. 2256 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 113, Nays 32, |
---|
58 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
61 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2256 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
62 | | - | amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
63 | | - | 1. |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
66 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Date |
---|
68 | | - | __________________ |
---|
69 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 60 | + | * * * * * |
---|