House | 05/06/2021 | Postponed 6/1/22 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Record vote RV#832 | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Wu | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Postponed 5/6/21 2:00 PM | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Record vote RV#764 | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Record vote RV#763 | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Amended 1-Middleton | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Postponed 5/5/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Filed |