Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Record vote RV#1027
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amended 1-Zwiener, Patterson, and E. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amended 3-Patterson and Toth
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Postponed 5/12/21 12:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amended 2-E. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amended 1-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|