Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2305 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/19/2021

                            By: Thompson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 2305
 (Senate Sponsor - Creighton)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas Real Estate Research Center, the Real Estate
 Research Advisory Committee, and the Texas Real Estate Commission;
 increasing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subchapter C, Chapter 86,
 Education Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C. TEXAS REAL ESTATE RESEARCH CENTER
 SECTION 2.  Section 86.51, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 86.51.  TEXAS REAL ESTATE RESEARCH CENTER. The Texas
 Real Estate Research Center [There] is established at Texas A&M
 University [a Real Estate Research Center, hereinafter referred to
 as the center]. The operating budget, staffing, and activities of
 the center shall be approved by the board of regents of The Texas
 A&M University System.
 SECTION 3.  Section 86.52, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (c), (d), (e), (f), (h), (i), (j), (k), and (l)
 and adding Subsection (m) to read as follows:
 (c)  Members [Except for the initial appointees, members] of
 the advisory committee hold office for staggered terms of six
 years, with the terms of three members expiring on January 31 of
 each odd-numbered year. [In making the initial appointments, the
 governor shall designate three members, including two
 representatives of the real estate industry and one representative
 of the general public, for terms expiring in 1973, three for terms
 expiring in 1975, and three for terms expiring in 1977.] Any
 vacancy shall be filled by appointment for the unexpired portion of
 the term. Each member shall serve until the member's [his]
 successor is qualified.
 (d)  The presiding officer [chairman] of the Texas Real
 Estate Commission, or a member of the commission designated by the
 presiding officer [him], shall serve as an ex officio, nonvoting
 member of the advisory committee.
 (e)  The advisory committee shall elect a presiding officer
 and an assistant presiding officer from the committee's [its]
 membership, and each officer shall serve for a term of one year.
 (f)  [The first meeting of the advisory committee shall be
 called by the president of Texas A & M University or his designated
 representative.] The advisory committee shall meet not less than
 semiannually, and in addition on call of the committee's presiding
 officer [its chairman], or on petition of any six of the committee's
 [its] members, or on call of the president of Texas A&M [A & M]
 University or the president's [his] designated representative.
 (h)  The president of Texas A&M [A & M] University or the
 president's [his] designated representative shall submit to the
 advisory committee in advance of each fiscal year a proposed budget
 for expenditures of all funds provided for the center in a form that
 is related to the proposed schedule of activities for the review and
 approval of the advisory committee. The proposed budget approved
 by the advisory committee shall be forwarded with the comments of
 the committee to the board of directors of The Texas A&M [A & M]
 University System prior to its action on the proposed budget, and
 the board of directors of The Texas A&M [A & M] University System
 shall not authorize any expenditure that has not had the prior
 approval of the advisory committee.
 (i)  The president of Texas A&M [A & M] University or the
 president's [his] designated representative shall submit to the
 advisory committee for its review and approval a research agenda at
 the beginning of each fiscal year and shall continuously inform the
 advisory committee of changes in its substance and scheduling.
 (j)  Each member of the advisory committee [board] is
 entitled to a per diem as provided in the center's budget [set by
 legislative appropriation] for each day that the member engages in
 the business of the committee [board]. A member may not receive any
 compensation for travel expenses, including expenses for meals and
 lodging, other than transportation expenses. A member is entitled
 to compensation for transportation expenses as provided in
 [prescribed by] the center's budget [General Appropriations Act].
 (k)  Except as provided by Subsection (l), the [The] advisory
 committee is subject to Chapter 551, Government Code, Chapter 2001,
 Government Code, and the provisions of Chapter 572, Government
 Code.
 (l)  The advisory committee may conduct a meeting by
 conference call or virtually through a third-party Internet
 application as long as members of the general public are able to
 participate in the meeting, and any discussions during the meeting,
 if the meeting is not permitted to be conducted as a closed meeting
 under Chapter 551, Government Code.
 (m)  The financial transactions of the center are subject to
 audit by the state auditor in accordance with Chapter 321,
 Government Code.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1101.054, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1101.054.  OFFICIAL OATH. Not later than the 15th
 calendar day after the date of appointment, each appointee must
 take the constitutional oath of office.
 SECTION 5.  Section 1101.154(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The fee for the issuance or renewal of a:
 (1)  broker license is the amount of the fee set under
 Section 1101.152 and an additional $70 fee for each year of the term
 for which the license is issued or renewed;
 (2)  sales agent license is the amount of the fee set
 under Section 1101.152 and an additional $20 fee for each year of
 the term for which the license is issued or renewed; and
 (3)  certificate of registration is the amount of the
 fee set under Section 1101.152 and an additional $20 fee for each
 year of the term for which the certificate is issued or renewed.
 SECTION 6.  Section 1101.154(a), Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to the issuance or renewal of a
 license or certificate of registration under Chapter 1101,
 Occupations Code, on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *