Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2306 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021