Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2309 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021