Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2337 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021