Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2345 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Zwiener (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 2345
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 21, 2021, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain counties to impose a hotel
 occupancy tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 352.002, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (aa) to read as follows:
 (aa) The commissioners court of a county that contains a
 headquarters and visitor center for a national historical park
 dedicated to a former president of the United States may impose a
 tax authorized by Subsection (a). The tax imposed under this
 subsection does not apply to a hotel located in a municipality that
 imposes a tax under Chapter 351 applicable to the hotel.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *