House | 04/27/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Filed |