1 | | - | H.B. No. 2365 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Lopez (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 2365 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the participation and reimbursement of certain military |
---|
6 | 12 | | medical treatment facilities and affiliated health care providers |
---|
7 | 13 | | under Medicaid. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, |
---|
10 | 16 | | is amended by adding Section 32.0275 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 17 | | Sec. 32.0275. MILITARY MEDICAL TREATMENT FACILITIES AND |
---|
12 | 18 | | AFFILIATED HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS; REIMBURSEMENT. (a) In this |
---|
13 | 19 | | section, "military medical treatment facility" means a military |
---|
14 | 20 | | medical treatment facility described by 10 U.S.C. Section 1073d(b), |
---|
15 | 21 | | (c), or (d). |
---|
16 | 22 | | (b) This section applies only to a military medical |
---|
17 | 23 | | treatment facility located in this state that has been verified as a |
---|
18 | 24 | | Level 1 trauma center by the American College of Surgeons or an |
---|
19 | 25 | | equivalent organization. |
---|
20 | 26 | | (c) A military medical treatment facility or a health care |
---|
21 | 27 | | provider providing services at a military medical treatment |
---|
22 | 28 | | facility is considered a provider under Medicaid for purposes of |
---|
23 | 29 | | providing and receiving reimbursement for: |
---|
24 | 30 | | (1) inpatient emergency services; and |
---|
25 | 31 | | (2) related outpatient services to the extent those |
---|
26 | 32 | | services are not available from an enrolled Medicaid provider at |
---|
27 | 33 | | the time the services are needed. |
---|
28 | 40 | | SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
29 | 41 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
30 | 42 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
31 | 43 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
32 | 44 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
33 | 45 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
34 | 46 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
37 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2365 was passed by the House on May 5, |
---|
38 | | - | 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 91, Nays 55, 1 present, not |
---|
39 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
40 | | - | No. 2365 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 91, Nays 54, |
---|
41 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
42 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
44 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2365 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
45 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays |
---|
46 | | - | 1. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
49 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Date |
---|
51 | | - | __________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 47 | + | * * * * * |
---|