Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#417
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Amended 1-Kuempel
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|