Senate | 04/26/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Record vote RV#417 | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Filed |