Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2438 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021