Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2450 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: Vasut, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2450
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to antique outboard motors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 31.003, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (19) to read as follows:
 (19)  "Antique outboard motor" means an outboard motor
 that is at least 40 years of age.
 SECTION 2.  Section 31.055, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.055.  EXCEPTIONS. This subchapter does not apply
 to:
 (1)  vessels with a valid marine document issued by the
 United States Coast Guard's National Vessel Documentation Center or
 a federal agency that is a successor to the National Vessel
 Documentation Center; or
 (2)  an antique outboard motor with a capacity of not
 more than 25 horsepower.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *