Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB246 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021