Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2497 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 2497


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment and duties of the Texas 1836 Project.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle D, Title 4, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 451 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 451. TEXAS 1836 PROJECT
 Sec. 451.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "1836 Project" means the advisory committee
 established under this chapter.
 (2)  "Patriotic education" includes the:
 (A)  presentation of the history of this state's
 founding and foundational principles;
 (B)  examination of how this state has grown
 closer to those principles throughout its history; and
 (C)  explanation of why commitment to those
 principles is beneficial and justified.
 (3)  "State agency" means a department, commission,
 board, office, or other agency in the executive branch of state
 government that is created by the constitution or a statute of this
 state.
 Sec. 451.002.  ESTABLISHMENT. (a) The 1836 Project is
 established as an advisory committee to promote patriotic education
 and increase awareness of the Texas values that continue to
 stimulate boundless prosperity across this state.
 (b)  The 1836 Project is composed of nine members reflective
 of the diversity of the state. The governor, lieutenant governor,
 and speaker of the house of representatives shall each appoint
 three members. The appointees may include persons in the private
 sector with relevant experience or subject matter expertise.
 (c)  Members serve two-year terms and may not be removed
 except for inefficiency, neglect of duty, or malfeasance.
 (d)  The governor shall appoint one member of the 1836
 Project as the presiding officer.
 (e)  The presiding officer shall:
 (1)  convene regular meetings of the 1836 Project; and
 (2)  coordinate and direct the activities of the 1836
 Project.
 Sec. 451.003.  DUTIES. (a)  The 1836 Project shall:
 (1)  promote awareness among residents of this state of
 the following as they relate to the history of prosperity and
 democratic freedom in this state:
 (A)  Texas history, including the indigenous
 peoples of this state, the Spanish and Mexican heritage of this
 state, Tejanos, the African-American heritage of this state, the
 Texas War for Independence, Juneteenth, annexation of Texas by the
 United States, the Christian heritage of this state, and this
 state's heritage of keeping and bearing firearms in defense of life
 and liberty and for use in hunting;
 (B)  the founding documents of this state;
 (C)  the founders of this state;
 (D)  state civics; and
 (E)  the role of this state in passing and
 reauthorizing the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965 (52 U.S.C.
 Section 10101 et seq.), highlighting:
 (i)  President Lyndon B. Johnson's signing
 of the act;
 (ii)  President George W. Bush's 25-year
 extension of the act; and
 (iii)  Congresswoman Barbara Jordan's
 successful efforts to broaden the act to include Spanish-speaking
 communities;
 (2)  advise the governor on the core principles of the
 founding of this state and how those principles further enrich the
 lives of its residents;
 (3)  facilitate the development and implementation of
 the Gubernatorial 1836 Award to recognize student knowledge of
 Texas Independence and other items listed in Subdivisions
 (1)(A)-(D);
 (4)  advise state agencies with regard to their efforts
 to ensure patriotic education is provided to the public at state
 parks, battlefields, monuments, museums, installations, landmarks,
 cemeteries, and other places important to the Texas War for
 Independence and founding of this state, as appropriate and
 consistent with applicable law; and
 (5)  facilitate, advise on, and promote other
 activities to support public knowledge of and patriotic education
 on the Texas War for Independence and founding of this state, as
 appropriate and consistent with applicable law.
 (b)  In carrying out its duties under Subsection (a)(2), the
 project may solicit statements and contributions from intellectual
 and cultural figures.
 Sec. 451.004.  FUNDING; COMPENSATION. (a) The Texas
 Education Agency shall provide funding and administrative support
 for the 1836 Project, including for the pamphlets described by
 Section 451.005, to the extent funds are available for those
 purposes.
 (b)  A member of the 1836 Project is not entitled to
 compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for the travel
 expenses incurred by the member while transacting project business,
 as provided by the General Appropriations Act.
 Sec. 451.005.  PAMPHLET. Not later than September 1, 2022,
 the 1836 Project shall provide a pamphlet to the Texas Department of
 Public Safety that explains the significance of policy decisions
 made by this state that promote liberty and freedom for businesses
 and families. The contents must include:
 (1)  an overview of Texas history and civics;
 (2)  the legacy of economic prosperity in this state;
 and
 (3)  the abundant opportunities for businesses and
 families in this state.
 Sec. 451.006.  REPORT. (a)  Not later than September 1,
 2022, the 1836 Project shall prepare and produce a written report
 that includes:
 (1)  a description of the activities of the project;
 (2)  the findings and recommendations of the project;
 (3)  a plan that identifies the best method of carrying
 out the duties under Sections 451.003(a)(1), (4), and (5);
 (4)  any proposals for legislation; and
 (5)  any other matter the project considers
 appropriate.
 (b)  Subsequent to the report required under Subsection (a),
 the 1836 Project may prepare and produce additional reports the
 project considers appropriate.
 (c)  The Texas Education Agency shall make a report described
 by this section available to the public on the agency's Internet
 website.
 (d)  To the extent existing agency resources are available
 for this purpose, the Texas Education Agency may provide to the 1836
 Project any agency resources necessary to prepare or produce a
 report described by this section.
 Sec. 451.007.  ABOLITION; EXPIRATION. The 1836 Project is
 abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2036.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.013.  TEXAS 1836 PROJECT PAMPHLET. (a) The
 department shall provide the pamphlet described by Section 451.005,
 Government Code, to persons who receive a driver's license:
 (1)  after applying under Section 521.144; or
 (2)  with an expiration provided by Section
 521.271(a-2) or (a-3).
 (b)  The department shall make the pamphlet described by
 Section 451.005, Government Code, available to the public on the
 department's Internet website.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as possible after the effective date of
 this Act, the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of
 the house of representatives shall make the appointments to the
 1836 Project under Section 451.002, Government Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 4.  The Texas Education Agency and the Department of
 Public Safety of the State of Texas are required to implement a
 provision of this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 specifically for that purpose. If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, those agencies
 may, but are not required to, implement a provision of this Act
 using other appropriations available for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2497 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 124, Nays 19, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2497 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 133, Nays 13,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2497 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 21, Nays
 10.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor