Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2509 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Lucio III, Martinez, Muñoz, Jr. H.B. No. 2509
 (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2021;
 May 3, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to measures to support or enhance graduate medical
 education for the practice of podiatric medicine in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 58A.001(5), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (5)  "Graduate medical education program" means:
 (A)  a nationally accredited post-doctor of
 medicine (M.D.) or post-doctor of osteopathic medicine (D.O.)
 program that prepares physicians for the independent practice of
 medicine in a specific specialty area; and
 (B)  a nationally accredited post-doctor of
 podiatric medicine (D.P.M.) program that prepares podiatrists for
 independent practice in the specialty area of podiatry.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *