Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021