Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2556 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 1, 2021