Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2557 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021