|
05/24/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
05/24/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/12/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Record vote RV#147
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Amended 1-Holland
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|